THE WILDLIFE TRUST FOR BIRMINGHAM AND THE BLACK COUNTRY LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wildlife Trust works to make the environment of Birmingham and the black country a better place for wildlife and people through environmental education, community involvement, ecological and practical work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£1,650,655
Donations and legacies | £338.59k | |
Charitable activities | £1.27m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £40.84k |
Total expenditure:
£1,628,889
Raising funds | £32.65k | |
Charitable activities | £1.60m | |
Other | £0 |
£7,568 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £55,000 from 5 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £32.65k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.60m | |
Retained for future use | £21.77k |
Income generation and governance | £32.65k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.60m | |
Retained for future use | £29.33k |
People
35 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
335 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 11 March 1983: Standard registration
- THE WILDLIFE TRUST FOR BIRMINGHAM AND THE BLACK COUNTRY (Working name)
- WEST MIDLANDS URBAN WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Waheed Saleem | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Nicholson-Evans | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Daniel | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sabra Khan | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Matthew Moran | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eamon Fergal Mooney | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Wayro | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Green | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Helen McLellan | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
James David Larner | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Lisa Clare Pinney MBE | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip William Beardmore | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anna Louise Bright | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £978.06k | £1.50m | £1.33m | £1.74m | £1.65m | |
|
Total expenditure | £878.52k | £1.03m | £1.05m | £1.29m | £1.63m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £272.60k | £126.83k | £105.50k | £27.00k | £55.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.90k | £40.46k | £91.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £236.88k | £457.84k | £281.57k | £312.02k | £338.59k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £716.38k | £1.04m | £1.05m | £1.42m | £1.27m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £9.04k | £6.41k | £0 | £2.92k | £40.84k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £15.76k | £180.58k | £1.00k | £1.79k | £700 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £838.38k | £988.28k | £1.02m | £1.26m | £1.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £40.14k | £37.32k | £24.32k | £29.61k | £32.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.89k | £13.80k | £17.15k | £26.52k | £26.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £159.31k | £139.43k | £122.16k | £596.99k | £587.20k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £690.70k | £1.18m | £1.50m | £1.57m | £1.49m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £186.79k | £186.53k | £204.08k | £303.05k | £180.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 DECEMBER 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1. FOR BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ADVANCE PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION MAINTENANCE STUDY AND PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE AND ITS HABITATS, PLACES OF NATURAL BEAUTY, PLACES OF ZOOLOGICAL BOTANICAL GEOGRAPHICAL ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, FEATURES OF LANDSCAPE WITH GEOLOGICAL, PHYSIOGRAPHICAL OR AMENITY VALUE. FOR FURTHER OBJECTS SEE MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY URBAN AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Centre of the Earth
42 Norman Street
BIRMINGHAM
B18 7EP
- Phone:
- 01215230094
- Email:
- info@bbcwildlife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window