Trustees CHAPEL ARTS STUDIOS
Charity number: 1185771

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay May | Chair | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Rolfe-Tarrant | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Adams | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Ronda Gowland-Pryde | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Marchant | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tony Spencer | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Toby Benjamin Michael | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
YINNON EZRA MBE | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.