SOUTHAMPTON AND WINCHESTER VISITORS GROUP

Charity number: 1183558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Sandeman Courtice Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Catherine Mary Hartley Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Jackie Batchelor Trustee 16 November 2020 None on record
William Quentin Brook-Hart Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Stanislaw Bogdan Kozlowski Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Jeyatharshan Vettivel Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Professor Christopher Stephens Chair 23 May 2019 None on record
David John Retter Trustee 16 December 2019 None on record
Revd Dr Stephen Robert Sizer Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Momodou S Bah Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Claudia Maria Glyn Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
David Smith Trustee 20 September 2021 None on record