SEE A BRIGHTER AFRICA (SABA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of SABA are to relieve sickness and to preserve good health amongst those in need by means of, but not exclusively, the provision/assistance in the provision of health facilities for the diagnosis and treatment of albinism, malaria and other infectious diseases, and provision/assistance in the provision of health education and training for public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Malawi
Governance
- 15 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ZHANHAN TU | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor CRISTIAN CONSTANTINESCU | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr VIRAL SHETH | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor IRENE CONSTANTINESCU-GOTTLOB | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.92k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.47k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 April 2021 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 April 2021 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTH FACILITIES, SUCH AS CLINICS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF MALARIA, ALBINISM, EYE DISEASES AND OTHER INFECTIOUS DISEASES, AND PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF MEDICAL CONDITIONS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 GUILFORD ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 2RB
- Phone:
- 07843842200
- Email:
- vs109@le.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window