FOUNTAINS CHURCH BRADFORD

Charity number: 1183423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian faith within Bradford by providing a space for prayer and worship, open daily and to take its mission out to the surrounding areas. To engage with and aim to help those on the margins of society in recovery from addiction and prevention and reduction of need. To be a home to one or more social enterprises, bringing people in for activity that encourages meeting and sharing

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2019: CIO registration
  • 05 May 2023: Funds received from 1160107 TRJFP CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • FOUNTAINS CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RT REVD DR TOBY MATTHEW HOWARTH Chair 15 May 2019
LEEDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
WELLSPRINGS TOGETHER
Received: On time
Rev Sharon Bavington Trustee 02 July 2023
None on record
Shelby Pocock Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Rev Chris Enwerem Trustee 08 January 2023
None on record
Gareth John Medd Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Dr Oluwaseun Eniola Olabode Trustee 24 April 2022
KINGDOM BUSINESS BUILDERS
Recently registered
Joanna Naomi Douglas Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Dr Hendrika Jolley Trustee 09 November 2020
None on record
TERRY HENRY Trustee 04 May 2020
None on record
Jonathan Wood Trustee 04 May 2020
OASIS AQUILA HOUSING
Received: On time
Rev Nathanael Poole Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Rev Linda Maslen Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
The Venerable Dr Andrew John Jolley Trustee 15 May 2019
LEE ABBEY HOUSEHOLD COMMUNITIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £74.47k £249.55k £361.11k £367.02k £627.76k
Total expenditure £68.82k £167.69k £275.57k £387.06k £632.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.33k N/A £11.50k £7.93k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £598.82k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £28.05k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £891
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £630.50k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.84k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £242.67k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £99.97k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Glydegate Square
Glydegate
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD5 0BQ
Phone:
01133530290