Accounts and annual returns THE RDC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1184154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2022 18 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 18 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2021 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 21 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2020 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 03 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window