Accounts and annual returns NOMAD ACADEMY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1185184
Charity reporting is overdue by 1177 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 82 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 82 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 447 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 812 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1177 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window