LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST MONICA'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 513694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Ian Jackson Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
Michael Clarke Trustee 11 June 2020 None on record
PETER GLOSSOP Trustee 15 August 2011
KING'S SCHOOL PONTEFRACT ENDOWMENT CHARITY AND OTHER CHARITIES Received: On time
THE GALTRES CENTRE CHARITY Received: 10 days late
Graham Pratt Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
Jennifer Rhodes Trustee 12 December 2018 None on record
JOHN KIRMAN Trustee 28 July 2013 None on record
Terry Lynne Saeedi Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
Derek McLuckie Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record
David Kenworthy Chair 06 June 2019 None on record
Sharon Metcalfe Trustee None on record
Dr Lorraine Boyd Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
Peter Berry Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record