GOSFORTH RECREATION AND ATHLETIC GROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513720
Charity reporting is 339 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 Not yet received
339 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not yet received
339 days overdue
Annual return 31 May 2018 20 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 04 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2015 10 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)