Critical Care Support Network

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a support group for anyone who has experienced critical illness within Intensive Care (ICU). We support former patients and those close to them - all the services and activities we offer are free. We have weekly Drop-In meetings to meet others with similar problems, Exercise sessions to rebuild strength, and Relaxation training to combat stress plus social events - all currently on Zoom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2019: CIO registration
- CC-SN (Working name)
- ICUSTEPS CHESTER (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miles Gervase Negus-Fancey | Chair | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Ruffell | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hinds | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dean | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Quentin Nigel Underhill | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £10.05k | £21.40k | £7.90k | £18.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £7.60k | £15.86k | £18.08k | £16.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.07k | £3.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Mar 2019 as amended on 20 Jul 2021 as amended on 20 Jul 2021 as amended on 20 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF CURRENT AND FORMER CRITICAL CARE PATIENTS , THEIR FAMILY MEMBERS, AND CARERS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES, AND THROUGH ENGAGING WITH AND ASSISTING OTHER INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS TOWARDS THE SAME AIMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bluecoat
Upper Northgate Street
Chester
CH1 4EE
- Phone:
- 07955848596
- Email:
- info@cc-sn.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window