THE CHILDREN'S CANCER AND LEUKAEMIA GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund and support innovative world-class research and collaborate, both nationally and internationally, to drive forward improvements in childhood cancer. Our award-winning information resources help lessen the anxiety, stress and loneliness commonly felt by families, giving support throughout the cancer journey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£9,823,023
Donations and legacies | £2.80m | |
Charitable activities | £6.97m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £56.18k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,651,658
Raising funds | £348.01k | |
Charitable activities | £7.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £265,270 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £348.01k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.30m | |
Retained for future use | £2.17m |
People

22 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- CCLG (Working name)
- CHILDREN'S CANCER AND LEUKAEMIA GROUP (Working name)
- TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH CANCER (Working name)
- TYAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Oxnam | Chair | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Curtis | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
GAYLE ROUTLEDGE | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL WILCOX | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.27m | £3.89m | £5.67m | £8.31m | £8.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.33m | £4.05m | £5.40m | £7.77m | £7.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £71.76k | £36.90k | £241.32k | £265.27k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.13m | £1.23m | £1.45m | £1.90m | £2.80m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.13m | £2.59m | £4.21m | £6.41m | £6.97m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.84k | £2.02k | £1.86k | £5.94k | £56.18k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £71.76k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £117.45k | £425.00k | £253.19k | £255.79k | £130.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.08m | £3.77m | £5.04m | £7.40m | £7.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £253.01k | £207.51k | £327.06k | £377.05k | £348.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.35k | £29.12k | £35.45k | £24.39k | £35.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £5.21m | £3.03m | £4.27m | £6.34m | £5.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £71.76k | £36.90k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £51.15k | £41.52k | £41.44k | £42.49k | £31.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.59m | £7.07m | £7.85m | £9.00m | £10.53m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.83m | £5.46m | £5.97m | £6.58m | £7.28m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH CANCER AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND SOCIAL CONSEQUENCES OF CANCER IN CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH (2) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO THEM (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CANCER IN CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND CLINICAL PRACTICE BY THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE LATEST RESEARCH AND BEST PRACTICE AMONGST PROFESSIONALS AND PRACTITIONERS ENGAGED IN THE TREATMENT, CARE AND SUPPORT OF CHILDREN, TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH CANCER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Childrens Cancer & Leukaemia Group
Century House
24 De Montfort Street
LEICESTER
LE1 7GB
- Phone:
- 03330507654
- Email:
- info@cclg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window