BRIDGNORTH AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 513781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.39k £7.04k £8.45k £13.97k £4.94k
Total expenditure £15.06k £8.81k £7.47k £12.69k £5.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A