Governing document The elderly and disabled charitable trustuk
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 29 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2021 AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2022 AMENDED ON 19 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
"TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY, THEY ARE ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS, AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. “TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE, ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. "TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. "TO ADVANCE THE THE EDUCATION OF THE OLDER COMMUNITY IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. "TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY BY THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMICAL GROWTH AND REGENERATION. "TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN SURROUNDING AREAS OF NW10, SUCH AS ELDERLY ETHNIC COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF AGE AND BELIEFS, AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE THROUGH ASSISTED INTEGRATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.