HARROW STEEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harrow Steel is an Arts Education charity that operates in North West London. Our aim to provide students, from a variety of backgrounds, the opportunity to learn about Steel Pan music and the music of other cultures, particularly for those who may not otherwise be able to access this provision. Through the workshops, young people will gain skills in teamwork, resilience and musicianship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
Governance
- 13 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Benson | Chair | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yen Ny Yee | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Henry-Wordsworth | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LEANARD PHILLIP | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Hallett | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Hallett | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Rance | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ruth Rimmer | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Keighley | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/12/2020 | 12/12/2021 | 12/12/2022 | 12/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.53k | £13.45k | £24.73k | £22.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.52k | £11.32k | £20.57k | £16.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 155 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR STEELPAN MUSIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 BURWOOD AVENUE
PINNER
HA5 2RZ
- Phone:
- 07930310360
- Email:
- soojoseph@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
harrowsteel.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window