ST MICHAEL'S AND LARK LANE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £148.53k £141.37k £165.66k £154.63k £224.08k
Total expenditure £168.77k £171.17k £163.25k £167.15k £163.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.00k £0 N/A £98.05k £78.71k