Accounts and annual returns CYCLE SISTERS

Charity number: 1183189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window