THE INTERNATIONAL ROUNDTABLE FOR SUSTAINABLE TEA (THIRST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THIRST brings together civil society actors from tea producing & tea consuming countries to improve the lives of tea workers & farmers, their families & communities. We share knowledge & experience, bring together our unique perspectives & speak out when necessary, challenging & supporting companies & governments to deliver on their responsibilities in line with UNGPs, SDGs and ILO conventions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 15 May 2020: CIO registration
- THIRST - The International Roundtable for Susainable Tea (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celine Gilart | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leena Camadoo | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Filbert Kavia | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Nyambura | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stirling Smith | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Nikhil Subbiah | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debra Coulter OBE | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.54k | £71.99k | £77.08k | £60.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.41k | £66.19k | £58.88k | £63.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 May 2023 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 May 2023 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2020
Charitable objects
PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR CIVIL SOCIETY ORGANISATIONS TO WORK TOGETHER FOR: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES IN TEA GROWING AREAS; (B) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONG THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES ON TEA PLANTATIONS AND SMALL TEA FARMS; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION OF TEA GROWING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uk Postbox Unit 36017
PO Box 6945
LONDON
W1A 6US
- Phone:
- 07773949787
- Email:
- contact@thirst.international
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window