THE HOMELESS PERIOD - WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity number: 1183408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We undertake activities to reduce Period Poverty across Wolverhampton via the collection and distribution of menstrual products, toiletries and associated items. We also deliver workshops in schools regarding menstruation and to raise awareness of Period Poverty. Items are distributed to individuals, schools. colleges, universities and organisations supporting those experiencing poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £18,644
Total expenditure: £18,269

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • PeriodsMatter. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dawn Catherine Wilkes Chair 19 June 2024
None on record
Helen Kenny Trustee 26 July 2018
None on record
Jessica Elizabeth Labhart Trustee 26 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £1.67k £26.56k £6.46k £18.64k
Total expenditure £10.37k £15.71k £11.92k £18.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Periods Matter
Office 1
All Saints Action Network
All Saints Road
Wolverhampton
WV2 1EL
Phone:
03007701561