THE FRIENDS OF KIRKANDREWS UPON ESK CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraise for Kirkandrews Upon Esk Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moira Fisher | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Batey | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Fairfax Westoll | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Rose Jane Thomlinson | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Batey | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Ewart | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Massiah | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Deirdre Jean Westoll | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.12k | £1.36k | £5.47k | £6.67k | £7.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £1.57k | £800 | £2.42k | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2024 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2024 | 293 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, PROTECT, REPAIR, RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE INTERNAL AND EXTERNAL FABRIC OF KIRKANDREWS UPON ESK CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
SMALMSTOWN FARM
LONGTOWN
CARLISLE
CA6 5LH
- Phone:
- 07786165262
- Email:
- moira@smalmstown.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window