Trustees THE DEDDINGTON CHARITY ESTATES

Charity number: 1188691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN EDWARD JAMES SAMPSON Chair 16 September 2010
FRIENDS OF HEMPTON CHURCH
Received: On time
Colin Overend Hamilton Lambert Trustee 15 January 2020
FRIENDS OF DEDDINGTON CHURCH
Recently registered
Maureen Bernedette Cox Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Julie Maria Westley Trustee 25 February 2016
None on record
ANN LESLEY GOLDTHORP Trustee 12 February 2014
HEMPTON COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN MICHAEL LIEBRECHT BA LIM Trustee 02 December 2010
DEDDINGTON WINDMILL COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Helen Margaret Oldfield Trustee 05 August 2010
None on record
Fern Leonie Stringer Trustee 18 March 2010
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN TWOMEY Trustee 11 October 2006
None on record