Accounts and annual returns EMMANUEL CHURCH DROITWICH

Charity number: 1182879
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 December 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 December 2020 47 days late Download Open in new window