Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE WITH ST. NICHOLAS, YORK
Charity number: 1182907

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Adam John Aidan Romanis | Chair | 03 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Anne Page | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hall | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Holmes | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Kirsten Celeste Beverly | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Page | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Tallis Breare | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christian Lucas Price | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Bickford | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Dingwall | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Roger Ward | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henry Qian Li Edward Dyer | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Dickson | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eileen Jordan | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kevin David Atkinson | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.