Accounts and annual returns THE LETHERHEAD INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1185057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 12 April 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window