THE ROBERT ALLEN LIFE PROMOTION AND HEALTHY HEARTS TRUST (RALPHH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps save lives by the provision of defibrillation equipment at places of sporting exertion; by providing financial support for medical testing to determine if young people are putting themselves at risk through heart or circulatory conditions previously unknown. The charity also provides information to adults looking to move away from extensive physical sport in a safe way.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Allen | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Edmund Patrick Green | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Connor Lucas Rawlins | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hawk Liversage | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.27k | £5.46k | £1.04k | £39.07k | £8.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18k | £1.14k | £6.87k | £10.41k | £12.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO [IS][ARE] TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- 1) EXTENDING THE NATIONAL AVAILABILITY AND ACCESS TO QUALITY DEFIBRILATION OR DIAGNOSTIC EQUIPMENT AT LOCATIONS OF SPORTING EXERTION, WITH PARTICULAR PRIORITY GIVEN TO ROWING; 2) PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING AND WHERE JUDGED NECESSARY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR ELECTRO CARDIAC TESTING AMONG YOUTH AND ADULT ROWERS AS WELL AS THOSE CONSIDERING PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF ROWING ACROSS THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND 3) PROVIDING PUBLISHED ADVISORY MATERIAL FOR EXISTING ROWERS WHO HAVE PLANS TO WITHDRAW FROM THE SPORT AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, DRAWING ATTENTION TO AN ASSOCIATED PHASED REDUCTION STRATEGY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 THE RIDGE
SURBITON
KT5 8HU
- Phone:
- 02083902732
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window