PURE WORD CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding services, meetings and broadcasting messages of evangelical nature for the advancement of the Christian Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 July 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FISAYO OLUBIYI | Chair | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adeola Olubiyi | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.71k | £9.05k | £15.77k | £10.47k | £10.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £669 | £1.36k | £8.23k | £6.26k | £1.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LOCAL COMMUNITIES, AND WORLDWIDE BY: ESTABLISHING CHURCHES, MINISTRIES, COMMUNITY CENTRES, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES, AND BROADCASTING MESSAGES OF EVANGELICAL AND TEACHING NATURE FOR THE PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; ORGANISING MEETINGS, SEMINARS, CONFERENCES, PROGRAMMES, TRAININGS AND OTHER FORMS OF ASSEMBLIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN ACHIEVING THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY; LEADING, ENCOURAGING AND EMPOWERING BELIEVERS, BY THE GRACE OF GOD, TO DEVELOP RICH PERSONAL RELATIONSHIPS WITH JESUS CHRIST, GROWING IN GRACE AND KNOWLEDGE OF GOD, PRACTICING THE PRINCIPLES IN THE HOLY WORD OF GOD FOR SUCCESSFUL, QUALITY, BALANCED, HOLY, HEALTHY, JOYOUS, PROSPEROUS AND FRUITFUL LIVES; MAKING THEM EQUIPPED TO PREACH THE GOSPEL OF JESUS TO OTHERS AND TO DISCIPLE OTHERS; PRODUCING BOOKS, ARTICLES, LEAFLETS, VIDEOS, AUDIOS, OR OTHER FORMS OF PUBLICATIONS AND DISTRIBUTING SAME BY ALL MEANS POSSIBLE (IN HARD OR SOFT COPY, ONLINE OR OFFLINE, ETC.) FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY; RELIEVING POVERTY, SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO THE POOR AMONG ITS MEMBERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AT LARGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, COUNSELLING, PRAYERS, FOOD, MATERIAL GOODS, SERVICES OR ANY OTHER MEANS OF ACHIEVING THESE; ADVANCEMENT OF OTHER CHARITABLE WORKS CALCULATED TO AID IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
LONDON
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 0333 567 1012
- Email:
- info@pureword.org.uk
- Website:
-
pureword.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window