Trustees JOSEPH ROWNTREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1184957
Charity reporting is up to date (112 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Tannahill Prof Chair 31 July 2019
None on record
Anita Bhatia Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Professor Joanna Kate Swaffield Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Zeinab Farah Elahi Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Hilary Cottam Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Lesley Gillian Russell Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Kenechukwu Ifeanyi Umeasiegbu Trustee 23 March 2021
Count Us In
Received: On time
Dr Saphie Ashtiany Trustee 16 September 2019
ENGLISH TOURING THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
PAUL JENKINS Trustee 31 July 2019
MENTAL HEALTH UK
Received: On time
DEBORAH CADMAN OBE Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
David Lunts Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record