Trustees 1ST DOWNTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1183184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ross Arnold Chair 01 April 2019
None on record
Ian Porter Trustee 18 September 2021
None on record
Rebecca Cornell Trustee 18 September 2021
None on record
Sarah Hurst Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Jonathan Edwards Trustee 20 July 2017
None on record
Lisa Kynaston Trustee 09 February 2017
None on record
Kevin Hill Trustee 05 May 2015
None on record
Peter Ullyatt Trustee 12 March 2015
None on record