Trustees LYTHAM ST ANNES PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 513963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Ogilvie | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jennifer Wolstenholme | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Parkinson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Foreman | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Maria Round | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Coulson | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daryl Giles | Trustee | 31 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Cahill | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Halstead | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Watson | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Watson | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DICKSON | Trustee | 08 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.