ECHO VOCAL ENSEMBLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Echo is a professional vocal ensemble that aims to perform the highest quality music in the least pretentious way possible. We want to inform, entertain, and inspire audiences across the UK, while getting every audience singing. Our aim is to explore the full range of what ensemble singing can achieve, including improvisation and multi-disciplinary collaborations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 November 2019: CIO registration
- Echo (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Randall | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Dawson | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hansell | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Neudegg | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Sargeant | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nick Jackman | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Taylor | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.69k | £62.90k | £44.76k | £31.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.16k | £57.28k | £42.54k | £33.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ELLESMERE CLOSE
CAVERSHAM
READING
RG4 5HG
- Phone:
- +447732662181
- Email:
- echovocalensemble@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window