Trustees RYE HARBOUR SAILABILITY (RHS)
Charity number: 1183222

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Parkin | Chair | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna O'Shea | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frederic Donovan Courtney Bennett | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Sinclair Phillips | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Davison | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Harris | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronan Quigley | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Crispin Farrant | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STUART ELLIOTT | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Rosalind Culver | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MARY WYLSON | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.