Trustees WHEATHAMPSTEAD U3A
Charity number: 1184014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Elaine Chadney | Chair | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Fatima Anne Bigland | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ROWLAND BRETT | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Myfanwy Hawkins | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dexter Ghelfi | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Monique Denham | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Mary Spurgeon | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Karen Whiting | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Margaret Willgress | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Walford | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen E Warr | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.