Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S FRITTENDEN
Charity number: 1183170

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN THOBURN STANSFELD | Chair | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Isobel Lydia Mehrabian | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
LINDSEY CAROLINE MOORE | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY JOHN STAPLES | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER HUGH PAGE | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
JAMES ANDREW HIGHWOOD | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||||
JOANNA MARY BEECH | Trustee | 01 May 2009 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.