EVANS ARTS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Arts and Culture in Wilmslow and its neighbourhood
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 28 June 1983: Standard registration
- EVANS ART TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALICE P HERBERT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Georgina Louise Johnson | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Francis Joseph McCarthy | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Angela McPake | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|||||
GARRY OLSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALISON MARGARET WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN ARTHUR GOSLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.75k | £6.73k | £5.00k | £4.59k | £4.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.06k | £6.51k | £3.64k | £4.63k | £7.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 17 JANUARY 1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 10 AUGUST 1988 AND 22 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE IN WILMSLOW AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE SCHEME)
Area of benefit
WILMSLOW AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 St. Johns Road
Knutsford
WA16 0DL
- Phone:
- 01613040900
- Email:
- rjbirchall@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window