JUST KIDDING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhancing learning, social and living skills of children with social deficits from underprivileged homes. Our program is individualised to fit each child's need so that they can reach their potentials. We offer social skills play-scheme, after school club and summer project which harnesses communication skills. We help children and young people have a voice, understand others and feel understood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 26 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOLOMON BERKOWITZ | Chair | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
DAVID SCHREIBER | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Feige Krausz | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.60k | £127.68k | £93.23k | £115.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.75k | £107.91k | £89.86k | £122.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN SUBJECTS WHICH DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE PARTICIPANTS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 KNIGHTLAND ROAD
LONDON
E5 9HR
- Phone:
- 02084424275
- Email:
- rose.justkidding@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window