THE SCHOOL OF RADICAL DISCIPLESHIP

Charity number: 1185141
Charity reporting is overdue by 916 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement and propagation of the Christian Gospel and the promotion of teaching on all aspects of the Christian life and faith in accordance with Biblical principles. This includes the development of and making available of resources and materials that churches, community groups and individuals can use.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £2,122
Total expenditure: £1,851

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 September 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Oli Douglas-Pennant Chair 03 September 2019
None on record
Anna Hesed Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Narges Bagherabadi Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Elle Randall Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Joanne Cheung Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.12k
Total expenditure £1.85k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 551 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 551 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 916 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 916 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2022 332 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2022 332 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
122 WINDMILL ROAD
BRENTFORD
TW8 9NA
Phone:
07590878051
Website:

tobedisciples.org