APEX EXTREME

Charity number: 1183466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Apex Extreme aims to raise awareness for apex predators of the world and the threats to their survival in their wild habitats. Apex Extreme will achieve these goals with the use of educational talks, social media platforms and the Apex Extreme website. Apex Extreme will plan and deliver capital campaigns to raise vital funds in support of apex predator conservation programmes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 May 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID CRUMPTON Chair 23 April 2019
None on record
Andrew Cooper Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
Samantha Pardoe Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £261 £1.90k £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £261 £1.90k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 3
15 Stourbridge Road
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY10 2PN
Phone:
07841772806
Website:

WWW.APEXEXTREME.CO.UK