MERSHAM SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Mersham in Kent and surrounding areas by the provision of sports facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 10 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Douglaas Burton | Chair | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kenton Stewart | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Charles Fagg | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Beaney | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Jane Fagg | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Frederick Ambler | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Lesley-Ann Lloyd | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.49k | £74.77k | £103.53k | £446.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.81k | £71.83k | £141.64k | £416.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.60k | £10.10k | £50.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MERSHAM IN KENT AND SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CRICKET, FOOTBALL AND ARCHERY; AND 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MERSHAM IN KENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mersham Sports Club
FLOOD STREET
MERSHAM
ASHFORD
TN25 6NX
- Phone:
- 07958726127
- Email:
- mershamsportschair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window