THE BRIDGE YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MENTORING SECONDARY SCHOOL PUPILS. PASTORAL/CHAPLAINCY/EMOTIONAL LITERACY SUPPORT WORK IN SCHOOLS, DELIVERING LESSONS ON ASPECTS OF CHRISTIAN FAITH WITHIN THE RELIGIOUS STUDIES PROGRAMMES OF SECONDARY AND PRIMARY SCHOOLS; SPEAKING AT SCHOOL ASSEMBLIES, PRESENTING A CHRISTIAN STANDPOINT ON CURRENT ISSUES; RUNNING AFTER-SCHOOL CHRISTIAN CLUBS; ENCOURAGING CHRISTIAN STUDENT GROUPS IN SCHOOLS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 July 2019: CIO registration
- 13 October 2023: Funds received from 1034800 BRIDGE YOUTH PROJECT TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HAVERN GRAHAM | Chair | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Wesley Thorpe | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Derek Charles Holloway | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Christine Mary Starmer | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID MONKTON WRAIGHT | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Donald John Robert Morgan | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Jane Kelly | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.28k | £190.37k | £223.70k | £276.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.81k | £197.52k | £259.95k | £261.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £67.96k | £32.44k | £4.14k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SALISBURY AREA AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY WORKING WITH YOUNG PEOPLE IN SCHOOLS THROUGH ACTIVITIES INCLUDING CHAPLAINCY, SUPPORT OF THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION CURRICULUM, COLLECTIVE WORSHIP, GROUPS AND CLUBS, MENTORING AND PASTORAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Pembroke Park Primary School
Devizes Road
SALISBURY
Wiltshire
SP2 9LY
- Phone:
- 01722 342430
- Email:
- office@the-bridge.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window