WROSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Wrose in the Metropolitan district of Bradford, West Yorkshire. To improve education and provide facilities for social welfare and recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 15 December 1983: Standard registration
- 28 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHRISTOPHER JESSOP | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vanda Greenwood | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alan Keith Sinfield | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hirsh | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
John David Waddington | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jean Hunter | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £10.00k | £1.32k | £1.67k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £8.65k | £5.31k | £5.22k | £4.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 1983
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WROSE IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OR RACE, SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON FORM TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AN LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO HOLD NECESSARY LAND OR PROPERTY ON BEHALF OF THE ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
WROSE IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD
Linked charities
- 15 December 1983 : Standard registration
- 28 January 2014 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 LOW ASH AVENUE
SHIPLEY
BD18 1JJ
- Phone:
- 01274589923
- Email:
- wrosecommassoc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window