VOICE OF ALBINISM

Charity number: 1185997
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The protection and preservation of good health among people with albinism Providing information, advice, practical and emotional support and events for such people and their families and careers designed to help with management of the condition and to raise confidence and self-esteem; Raising awareness in local communities, eradicating stigma & promoting wider acceptance of people with Albinism.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 June 2023

Total income: £500
Total expenditure: £511

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Ododo Chair 25 October 2019
NURTURING FOUNDATIONS
Received: On time
YETUNDE BABARINDE Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Shem Joseph Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Christian Tchidjo Trustee 17 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022 01/06/2023
Total gross income £0 £9.23k £398 £500
Total expenditure £0 £9.60k £1.14k £511
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.22k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Annual return 01 June 2023 09 July 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 09 July 2024 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2022 06 July 2023 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 06 July 2023 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2020 12 May 2021 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 10 June 2021 70 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 BRAITHWAITE ROAD
MANCHESTER
M18 7TJ
Phone:
07727719560