GRIMSBY ICE HOCKEY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's' Ice Hockey club training weekly and playing games during the season.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Smith | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Yorston | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gray | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Lyons | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jo Lyons | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.34k | £2.83k | £14.45k | £16.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | £3.55k | £15.39k | £13.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 August 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ICE HOCKEY (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING ICE HOCKEY ACTIVITIES). (B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grimsby Ice Rink
CROMWELL ROAD
GRIMSBY
North East Lincs
DN31 2BH
- Phone:
- 01472476019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window