LIFE IN CHRIST CHURCH UK

Charity number: 1185565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download