THE WYNDHAM COTTLE ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of Almshouses for people who are aged 55 years or above and who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 28 October 2019: CIO registration
- 14 August 2023: Funds received from 205293 WYNDHAM COTTLE ALMSHOUSES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAMILLA READ | Chair | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Willard | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhoderick Powell | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Luck | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Minchin | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £14.02k | £15.38k | £19.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.57k | £32.40k | £20.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE AGED 55 YEARS OR ABOVE AND WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND (B) TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAMSTEAD GRANGE
HAMSTEAD DRIVE
HAMSTEAD
YARMOUTH
PO41 0YE
- Phone:
- 01983760230
- Email:
- joannaminchin@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window