HOLBEACH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE A BUILDING FOR THE USE BY ALL PERSONS IN THE HOLBEACH DISTRICT WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION FOR ALL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING HEALTH, EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 August 1983: Standard registration
- HOLBEACH COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WARD | Chair | 21 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
David Cooper | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JACK LILLEY | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WELBURN | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MISS LIZZY COWARD | Trustee | 12 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS BIGGADIKE | Trustee | 20 March 2003 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL M GRATTON | Trustee | 20 March 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.10k | £27.20k | £22.67k | £24.89k | £22.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.72k | £13.95k | £19.31k | £23.94k | £22.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 25 APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HOLBEACH IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THEOBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLBEACH
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 FAIRFIELDS
HOLBEACH
SPALDING
PE12 7JE
- Phone:
- 01406426080
- Email:
- cherylgrat@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window