Trustees 17TH BARNSLEY (PENISTONE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 514173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Worthington | Chair | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Bedford | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Billard | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Dawson | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jayne Richardson | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Morley | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Chan | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Walne | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louis le Roux | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Westwood | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shanua Sykes | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Simpson | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.