Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WOLFRETON SCHOOL

Charity number: 514216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 October 2021 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 January 2020 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required