INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL AND SURGICAL AID

Charity number: 1183547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS IN THE THIRD WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES, NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE DOCTORS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF LOCAL HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN HEALTH CARE PROCEDURES BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES. www.ims-aid.org

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £200
Total expenditure: £474

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Abu Dhabi
  • Afghanistan
  • Ajman
  • Akrotiri
  • Aland Islands
  • Albania
  • Algeria
  • American Samoa
  • Andorra
  • Angola
  • Anguilla
  • Antarctica
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Argentina
  • Armenia
  • Aruba
  • Ascension
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Azerbaijan
  • Bahrain
  • Baker Island
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Belarus
  • Belgium
  • Belize
  • Benin
  • Bermuda
  • Bhutan
  • Bolivia
  • Bonaire
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • Botswana
  • Bouvet Island
  • Brazil
  • British Antarctic Territory
  • British Indian Ocean Territory
  • British Virgin Islands
  • Brunei
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Cape Verde
  • Cayman Islands
  • Central African Republic
  • Ceuta
  • Chad
  • Chile
  • China
  • Christmas Island
  • Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
  • Colombia
  • Comoros
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Cook Islands
  • Costa Rica
  • Croatia
  • Cuba
  • Cyprus
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Dhekelia
  • Djibouti
  • Dominica
  • Dominican Republic
  • Dubai
  • Easter Island
  • East Timor
  • Ecuador
  • Egypt
  • El Salvador
  • Equatorial Guinea
  • Eritrea
  • Estonia
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Falkland Islands
  • Faroe Islands
  • Fiji
  • Finland
  • France
  • French Guiana
  • French Polynesia
  • French Southern Territories
  • Fujairah
  • Gabon
  • Georgia
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Gibraltar
  • Greece
  • Greenland
  • Grenada
  • Guadeloupe
  • Guam
  • Guatemala
  • Guernsey
  • Guinea
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Guyana
  • Haiti
  • Heard Island And Mcdonald Islands
  • Honduras
  • Hong Kong
  • Howland Island
  • Hungary
  • Iceland
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jamaica
  • Japan
  • Jarvis Island
  • Jersey
  • Johnston Atoll
  • Jordan
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Kingman Reef
  • Kiribati
  • Kosovo
  • Kuwait
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Latvia
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Libya
  • Liechtenstein
  • Lithuania
  • Luxembourg
  • Macau
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Maldives
  • Mali
  • Malta
  • Marshall Islands
  • Martinique
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Mayotte
  • Melilla
  • Mexico
  • Micronesia
  • Midway Islands
  • Moldova
  • Monaco
  • Mongolia
  • Montenegro
  • Montserrat
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Namibia
  • Nauru
  • Navassa Island
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • New Caledonia
  • New Zealand
  • Nicaragua
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Niue
  • Norfolk Island
  • Northern Ireland
  • Northern Mariana Islands
  • North Korea
  • Norway
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Oman
  • Pakistan
  • Palau
  • Palmyra Atoll
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Paraguay
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Puerto Rico
  • Qatar
  • Ras Al-khaimah
  • Réunion
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Saba
  • Saint Barthélemy
  • Saint Helena
  • Saint-Martin
  • Saint Pierre And Miquelon
  • Saint Vincent
  • Samoa
  • San Marino
  • São Tomé And Principe
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Scotland
  • Senegal
  • Serbia
  • Seychelles
  • Sierra Leone
  • Singapore
  • Sint Eustatius
  • Sint Maarten
  • Slovakia
  • Slovenia
  • Solomon Islands
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
  • South Korea
  • South Sudan
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Sudan
  • Suriname
  • Svalbard And Jan Mayen
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Syria
  • Taiwan
  • Tajikistan
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Bahamas
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Tokelau
  • Tonga
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Tristan Da Cunha
  • Tunisia
  • Turkey
  • Turkmenistan
  • Turks And Caicos Islands
  • Tuvalu
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Umm Al-quwain
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States
  • United States Virgin Islands
  • Uruguay
  • Uzbekistan
  • Vanuatu
  • Vatican City
  • Venezuela
  • Vietnam
  • Wake Island
  • Wallis And Futuna
  • Western Sahara
  • Yemen
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • IMSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Atef Selmy Awwad Selmy Chair 02 April 2019
None on record
Ibrahim Gaaman Eid Girmi Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Dr Hend Abdelhafez Abouelyazed Ahmed Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Dr Alhassan Ouda Attia Ghodeif Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Dr Mohamed Hassan Sayed Ahmed Mohamed Shaalan Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £11.65k £1.48k £1.06k £516 £200
Total expenditure £11.32k £1.84k £1.09k £338 £474
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 09 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 09 February 2023 346 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3rd Floor
St. George's House
6 St. Georges Way
Leicester
Phone:
07943566156