FRONT LINE NAVAL CHAPLAINS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work within the UK, undertaking research into the history of Royal Navy Chaplaincy; in particular, but not limited to, the impact of such ministry during armed conflicts. We undertake the creation and secure storage of an archive of relevant material and the dissemination and publication of that material by various means. We also run the Association of Royal Naval Chaplains.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Simon Paul Springett MA | Chair | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev David John Simpson | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Rory Brian Michael Clare | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Mark Alfred Barton | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Tudor James Thomas-Botwood MBE | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Alexander Christopher Nolan Buckley | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Edward Richard Wills | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Linda Mary Parker | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.12k | £2.03k | £8.21k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £1.04k | £3.56k | £1.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2020 as amended on 28 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the public in the subject of the history of Royal Navy Chaplaincy; in such ways as the charity trustees think fit, including by: a. research into the history of Royal Navy Chaplaincy and its contribution to the wellbeing of the Naval Service, naval service veterans and their families; in particular, but not limited to, the impact of such ministry during armed conflicts, and b. the creation and secure storage of an archive of relevant learning and material, in both digital and physical forms, to illustrate and evidence that history, and c. the dissemination and publication of that material and knowledge through the use of information media such as the internet, books, photographs, exhibitions, conferences and lectures. For the purpose of this clause, the naval service and the royal navy and royal marines includes the royal navy, royal marines, royal fleet auxiliary and ships taken up from the trade, together with embedded elements of the other armed forces and supporting organisations. To promote the military efficiency of the armed forces of the crown by identifying and encouraging excellence and best practice in Royal Naval chaplaincy through: a. running the Association of Naval Chaplains, to support the Naval Chaplaincy Service and to enable serving and former members to mix together, b. encouraging esprit de corps within naval chaplaincy.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Parish Office
Emmanuel Church
1 Compton Avenue
PLYMOUTH
PL3 5BZ
- Phone:
- 01752260317
- Email:
- FrontLineBish@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window