HAYLE PARK NATURE RESERVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hayle Park Nature Reserve Trust manages 60 acres of woodland, parkland pasture and wildflower meadows in Tovil, Maidstone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 10 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul John Wilby | Chair | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Josef Mark Higson | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Sinclair | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Shingleton | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Walter Usmar | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Robert Stovell | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Eugene Clark | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Emma Holman | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.17k | £5.84k | £6.05k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.09k | £18.66k | £36.84k | £16.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ("THE OBJECTS") SHALL CONSIST OF EACH OF THE FOLLOWING: A. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONVERSATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE HAYLE PARK NATURE RESERVE, MAIDSTONE, KENT. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE HAYLE PARK NATURE RESERVE. C. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE INHABITANTS OF MAIDSTONE, KENT, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDIALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID PEOPLE. PROVIDED THAT FACILITIES IN C SHALL NOT BE DETERMINAL TO PARTS A OR B.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Barn
Fieldfare Drive
Maidstone
Kent
me15 6xl
- Phone:
- 07949769276
- Email:
- haylepark@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window