Financial history HULL COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICES LTD

Charity number: 514311
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.69m £1.68m £1.91m £2.11m £2.09m
Total expenditure £1.56m £1.61m £1.81m £2.01m £2.02m
Income from government contracts £81.55k N/A £354.90k £548.08k £687.49k
Income from government grants £153.84k £142.00k £132.61k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.40k £0 £21.00k £12.05k £24.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £1.07m £1.15m
Income - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.68m £1.89m £1.02m £922.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £116
Income - Other £20.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £609.97k £1.61m £1.81m £1.03m £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £945.94k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.15k £8.90k £9.08k £3.46k £3.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £977.46k £959.15k